Trustees PCC CHILWELL
Charity Number: 1134214

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andy Tufnell | Chair | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Gibbon | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Beckham | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Ringrose | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hawley | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Tufnell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Mellor | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Ottewell | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Guy Gillibrand | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dixon | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Lee | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Redwood | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Onions | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Philippa Clarke | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Tim Hills | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Chris Brignell | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judith Renton | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Willmot | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Pringle | Trustee | 14 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.