Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE MELKSHAM PARISH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MELKSHAM, SALISBURY
Charity Number: 1138038

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Charlie Hector THOMSON | Chair | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Veronica Scull | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theo Bossom | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Susan Hewitt | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Thomson | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christof David Masheder | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Verrell | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David George Flower | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ernest Just | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Anne McLean | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian David Parr | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fivash | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Paterson | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stanford Cole | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Willis | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hucknall | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Maslen | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.