THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY`S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
weekly church services, pre-school (praise and play ) club. After school (jesus and me) club.CAMEO (come and meet each other) for the elderly or lonely. Youth group. Holiday clubs for primary children. Parish trips to explore faith and christian worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

21 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY`S PCC EASTHAM (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Caswell | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CATHRINE PRIDDING | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BRADLEY-GIBBONS | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN PATRICIA GARDNER | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE FINAN | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND ELISABETH ANN GLOVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ANN CHAMBERS BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE RICHARD WYNNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANNE YORK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN RUTH ABRAHAM BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY MARGARET CHRISTIANSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDNA INGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND THOMAS BONNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHEAL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN CULLEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANE LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYNLEY RUSSELL BOYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRENE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE BOYES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.60k | £163.17k | £118.79k | £15.39k | £150.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.14k | £217.48k | £126.79k | £146.52k | £150.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 January 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 January 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Lawns Avenue
WIRRAL
CH63 0NF
- Phone:
- 0155133259
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window