THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BLAKENALL TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spiritual and pastoral care of ecclesiastical parish of Blakenall Team. The PCC is committed to enabling as many people as possible to worship at our churches and to become part of our parish community at Christ Church and St. Chads.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 16 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- BLAKENALL TEAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ANN STONE | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY DOODY | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE HARRISON | Trustee | 01 April 1996 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP WHITTALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH LANGSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JOHN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN JOHN BEDNALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA JUNE KEAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN MARJORIE KILLIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN DIANE THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ROSE BEDNALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE MARY BATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTOR JOHN BATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JOHN LANGSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHANNE LESLEY HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.78k | £41.61k | £35.61k | £159.74k | £39.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.93k | £53.96k | £49.84k | £33.06k | £41.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 FARADAY ROAD
WALSALL
WS2 7ER
- Phone:
- 07742917766
- Email:
- mandykeay@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window