Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CROOKHAM

Charity Number: 1132174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Patricia Ash Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
John Wilkinson Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Melanie Trundle Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Pete Roberts Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Liam John Sleath Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Peter Bradley Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Briony Jane Allen Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Kevin Fox Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Marion Foreman Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Dr Keith Ian Mundy Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Eric Barnfield Trustee 15 September 2020
CROOKHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Andrew Munnings Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
David James Pooley Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
DR Mark Cross Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
ROSEMARY ANNE FOX Trustee 06 October 2011
None on record