THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDBURGHA YARDLEY

Charity number: 1131907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Within the ecclesiastical parish of Yardley, the charity promotes the whole mission of the Church of England.. The charity also gives financial support to other charites operating throughout the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £113,382
Total expenditure: £122,183

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • YARDLEY PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TAMMY TEAROE Chair 23 April 2024
None on record
DEBORAH FUDGE Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Mary Isabelle Bliss Trustee 27 June 2021
None on record
JULIE ANNE BRIDGES Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
CHRISTOPHER RICHARD DANIELS Trustee 08 April 2018
None on record
JULIE DAWN HILL Trustee 19 March 2017
None on record
LORRAINE NEWMAN Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
ENID MARGUERITE SEELEY Trustee
None on record
SYLVIA ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
HENRY WILLIAM BROCKBANK MA Trustee
None on record
BRIAN KENNETH NEWMAN Trustee
None on record
ANN HAVARD Trustee
None on record
SIMON PAUL WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £313.39k £90.95k £73.11k £99.47k £113.38k
Total expenditure £362.37k £102.67k £73.44k £107.39k £122.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £139.68k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 OLD CHURCH GREEN
BIRMINGHAM
B33 8QP
Phone:
01217896159
Website:

No information available