Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDBURGHA YARDLEY
Charity number: 1131907

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TAMMY TEAROE | Chair | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH FUDGE | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Isabelle Bliss | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE BRIDGES | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RICHARD DANIELS | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE DAWN HILL | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE NEWMAN | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ENID MARGUERITE SEELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HENRY WILLIAM BROCKBANK MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN KENNETH NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN HAVARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON PAUL WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.