Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, HAMPTON

Charity number: 1133768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £271.75k £283.11k £265.85k £274.74k £247.61k
Total expenditure £565.72k £267.66k £275.33k £337.33k £287.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £47.03k N/A £166 £9.86k N/A