THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST GUTHLAC, MARKET DEEPING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular worship, open to all. Promotion of Christianity by staging events and meetings; taking religious assemblies in schools; providing a youth group with a Christian ethos; promoting the Church's mission through activities for all; supporting other charities; teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and groups; visiting the sick and bereaved; the provision of a sacred place for prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST GUTHLAC'S PCC, MARKET DEEPING (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Georgina Leah Holding | Chair | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Stewart EVANS | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Scott Miller | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Keith Mitchell | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN Rowena EVANS | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Anne Gray | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jayne Stokoe | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Ann Howard BEd | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Martin Fowler | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David Thomas Hand | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Suzanne Cordelia Denton | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
James William Ronald Ward | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Frank Hilton | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Cooper | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Rose Cooper | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Bacon | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
LYALL ANTONY SEALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Nigel Bacon | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.20k | £82.63k | £95.70k | £106.92k | £148.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.60k | £93.17k | £101.46k | £109.16k | £121.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 PRIMROSES
DEEPING ST. JAMES
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 8SW
- Phone:
- 01778 346140
- Email:
- carol.c@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window