THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALBAN, NORTH HARROW

Charity number: 1132600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St. Alban's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent, the Revd. Dr Sarah Archer, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for the whole complex of St Alban's, North Harrow.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £369,157
Total expenditure: £377,682

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Harrow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. ALBAN'S PCC, NORTH HARROW (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sarah Elizabeth Archer Chair 18 August 2020
FIRMFOUNDATION
Received: On time
Simon William GREGORY MSc Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
ADRIAN ALEXANDER PATRICK HOLLOWAY Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Pauline Schofield Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Rev Irene Ann LAWRENCE BPhil Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Michael Julian Richard ORTON Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Shalomi Jebitha JEBARATNAM M.Ed Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Roger Neil HOLBURD Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
David John MARTIN Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Andrew GARNER Phd MA BA Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Noah Rajan KELLY Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Ninus Khalil KHAKO DipHe Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Supritha KOTIAN Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Spencer-Davis Trustee 25 April 2021
4TH HEADSTONE(ST ALBAN'S OWN) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THE BROOK STREET BAND TRUST
Received: On time
Peter Hinkley Trust for Young Musicians
Received: On time
Diane TUCK BSc Trustee 25 April 2021
BEAUCLERC LIMITED
Received: On time
Carys Margaret Grom Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Thomas Henry JOHNSON Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Julia Thamonda Michelle Skeete Powell Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
PAULINE MAY PRINCE Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £264.59k £238.94k £273.56k £288.49k £369.16k
Total expenditure £245.81k £290.50k £268.55k £349.00k £377.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.98k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PARISH OFFICE
St. Albans Church Hall
Norwood Drive
HARROW
HA2 7PF
Phone:
0208 429 1383