Financial history WEST YORKSHIRE DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1132348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £156.67k £159.54k £154.61k £138.28k £169.20k
Total expenditure £138.21k £134.85k £166.90k £173.99k £118.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.25k N/A N/A N/A