THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, ENFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to conduct religious (Christian) activities in the ecclesiastical parish of St Mary Magdalene, Enfield. This includes the provision of public worship and the conducting of weddings, funerals and baptisms. The church seeks to have a presence in the community in terms of activities for young people, retired people and for all ethnic groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £49,091 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Enfield
Governance
- 03 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY MAGDALENE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jean McDonald | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Joy Heywood | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Smith | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Kiddy | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Smart | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lodato | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Rolland | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dave Cockle | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Lawson | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH ELPHICK | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ken Cope | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Anneliese Fenwick | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANET REEVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.33k | £121.67k | £107.77k | £190.15k | £174.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.26k | £116.62k | £129.90k | £119.12k | £158.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £49.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 THE RIDGEWAY
ENFIELD
EN2 8QH
- Phone:
- 02033021010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window