THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S BECKENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities, helping the general public/mankind. provides buildings/facilities/open space. makes grants to organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
Governance
- 03 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST PAUL'S BECKENHAM PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rachel Maria Winn | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Clarissa Joy Harrington | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Wesley Robert Guy | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Roger Augustus Wells | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Maria Adu | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
David John Charlesworth | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Mary Harkness | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sandra Horner | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
ELIZABETH ANNE GORDON HOWICK | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Leslie Johnson | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul John Lashmar | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthea Dawn Prendergast | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Kearabiloe Tsholofelo Moldovan | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Butler | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Mark Griffiths | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
MR KEITH HOWICK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.66k | £159.72k | £160.90k | £171.80k | £173.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.37k | £223.00k | £139.91k | £166.34k | £186.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 MANOR WAY
BECKENHAM
BR3 3LN
- Phone:
- 02086580808
- Email:
- kandahowick43@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window