THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BELPER, ST.PETER

Charity number: 1132878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Parochial Church Coubcil with the Incumbent promotes the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evengelistic, social and ecumenical in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Belper St Peter

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £298,359
Total expenditure: £223,990

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • BELPER PCC (REG CHARITY NO. 1132878) (Working name)
  • ST PETER'S PCC, BELPER (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANNE MARGARET STRATTON Chair
ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH OR MISSION HALL
Received: On time
BELPER IN DUFFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Julian Hodgson Trustee 25 April 2023
BELPER SINGERS
Received: On time
Margaret Irene Mary Goddard Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Patience Atkinson-Gregory Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Barbara Ann Anderton Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Christopher John Craddy Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
JOHN STUART HASTINGS-THOMSON Trustee 08 September 2020
LMS-PATRIOT COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
SUSAN MARIE ALLEN Trustee 08 September 2020
ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH OR MISSION HALL
Received: On time
Derek Adams Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
Tracy Lynne Drake Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
Geraldine Comery Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Constance Sandra Beresford Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Christine Frances Catherall Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
David Tony Skelton Trustee 16 April 2019
ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH OR MISSION HALL
Received: On time
David Anderton Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
PHILIP JOHN THOMAS Trustee 16 April 2019
ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH OR MISSION HALL
Received: On time
Anne Louise Clark Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
Christopher Martin Gregson Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
Heather Sian Kellogg Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
Joan Helen Foster Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
KEITH WOLLERTON Trustee 21 April 2015
ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH OR MISSION HALL
Received: On time
REV CHARLES EDWARD BERESFORD Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Hodgson Trustee 22 October 2013
None on record
Rev APRIL TOMPKINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £233.10k £233.75k £245.83k £207.97k £298.36k
Total expenditure £232.99k £246.29k £229.45k £195.23k £223.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £500 N/A £600 £600

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 CHESTERFIELD ROAD
BELPER
DE56 1FD
Phone:
01773828772