GUNNERSBURY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching, teaching, baptism, Communion of the Lord's Supper - evangelism and mission, locally, regionally, nationally and internationally - the teaching, encouragement, welcome and inclusion of young people - nurture and growth of Christian disciples - education and training for Christian service - pastoral care - supporting other Christians
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- GBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROB WILKINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nathan Veall | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bubb | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Charles John Williams | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN MANSON | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|||||
PAUL VOGT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRUCE DUGUID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY MCGOVERN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £496.13k | £303.65k | £336.35k | £338.86k | £330.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.63k | £150.37k | £200.37k | £223.61k | £257.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 December 2020 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gunnersbury Baptist Church
34 Burlington Road
LONDON
W4 4BE
- Phone:
- 02089872965
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window