THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GREGORY AND ST. MARTIN, WYE

Charity number: 1135099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Wye PCC is committed to making the gospel of Jesus Christ accessable as possible to the people of the parish and to all who visit or pass through. We work hard to serve our local community, to encourage as many people as possible to encounter the risen Christ and to deepen their faith through prayer and scripture, music and sacrament.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £275,173
Total expenditure: £279,323

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • WYE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RAVI MICHAEL HOLY Chair 02 September 2011
None on record
Penny Anne Carsley Haynes Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Pamela Janet Clapham Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Robert Hotot Dudley Trustee 28 April 2022
WYE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES (INCORPORATING WILLIAM JARMAN)
Received: On time
Elisabeth Ann Hill Trustee 27 June 2021
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF ST. GREGORY AND ST. MARTIN AT WYE
Received: On time
Stephen Geoffrey Clapham Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
LUCY HARRIET HUNTINGTON Trustee 20 September 2020
WYE HERITAGE
Received: On time
HEAL FOR LIFE FOUNDATION UK
Received: On time
Mark John Hosea Trustee 20 September 2020
THE YORK GLAZIERS' TRUST
Received: On time
THE STAINED GLASS MUSEUM
Received: On time
Teresa Lynne Redfern Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Professor NICHOLAS JOHN RUSSELL Trustee 19 April 2014
None on record
David John Ross Trustee 10 October 2012
WYE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES (INCORPORATING WILLIAM JARMAN)
Received: On time
Rev LINDA ANN CROSS Trustee 02 September 2011
THE WYE AND BROOK INDIA TRUST
Received: On time
Dr MARK DAMIAN DELLER Trustee
WYE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES (INCORPORATING WILLIAM JARMAN)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £194.70k £171.31k £277.55k £200.70k £275.17k
Total expenditure £206.68k £176.05k £266.07k £214.83k £279.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.07k N/A N/A £6.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Zealds House
39 Church Street
Wye
Ashford
TN25 5BL
Phone:
01233813793