AIREBOROUGH FLOWER FUND HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide affordable rented accommodation for elderly people over 65 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 November 1970: Standard registration
- A F F H (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC TOMLINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA MARGARET MIDGLEY | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS GRANDISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.51k | £106.70k | £107.63k | £109.35k | £114.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.23k | £33.98k | £40.75k | £49.70k | £101.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 23 MAY 1995 ,AMENDED 23 FEBRUARY 1999 as amended on 06 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF NECESSITOUS CIRCIMSTANCES OR THE DISABILITIES AND INFIRMATIES OF OLD AGE ARE IN NEED THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE AIREBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ison Harrison Ltd
65 Victoria Road
Guiseley
LEEDS
LS20 8DQ
- Phone:
- 07534211132
- Email:
- tracey.jg@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window