THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JUDE, PLYMOUTH.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. The provision of family and youth work with a Christian ethos. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities and support for the local community including Senior Citizens, parents and toddlers. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST JUDES PCC, PLYMOUTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Yates | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Gordon Hadden | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Cook | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Smart | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Chiquita James | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Roper | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Macleod | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Roper | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rob Ponsford | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Weekes | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev TIMOTHY SMITH | Trustee | 27 April 2007 |
|
|||||
Debbie Macleod | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.88k | £213.69k | £138.37k | £126.51k | £241.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.06k | £222.98k | £93.81k | £97.94k | £97.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 MAY TERRACE
PLYMOUTH
PL4 8PP
- Phone:
- 01752672728
- Email:
- debmacleod1959@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window