INCHI TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of science for the public benefit, in particular by developing, reviewing and disseminating the internationally agreed standard representation, the International Union of Pure and Applied Chemistry (IUPAC) International Chemical Identifier (InChI), of defined chemical structures and their links to related information;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Russia
- United States
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RAYMOND BOUCHER | Chair | 14 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dawn Lorraine George | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Marie Patterson | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sonja Heidi Marlene Herres-Pawlis | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Nijs | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bruno | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Herrn Dr Steffen Pauly | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Hartshorn | Trustee | 21 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN KIDD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.19k | £143.65k | £133.15k | £146.19k | £133.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.85k | £137.69k | £118.79k | £200.06k | £231.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 13 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BY A DEVELOPING, REVIEWING AND DISSEMINATING THE INTERNATIONALLY AGREED STANDARD REPRESENTATION, THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY (IUPAC) INTERNATIONAL CHEMICAL IDENTIFIER (INCHI), OF DEFINED CHEMICAL STRUCTURE AND THEIR LINKS TO RELATED INFORMATION B DEVELOPING AN ORGANISATIONAL FRAMEWORK FOR IMPLEMENTATION OF AND COMPLIANCE WITH SUCH CODES OF PRACTICE C CONTRIBUTING TO THE USE AND UNDERSTANDING OF CHEMICAL STRUCTURE STANDARDS AND RELATED INFORMATION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Twickenham Court
Arbury Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2HX
- Phone:
- 01223432344
- Email:
- member-info@inchi-trust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window