CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE'S PARTNERSHIP IN SOMERSET

Charity number: 1132468
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Known as CHYPPS, a network organisation of over 120 voluntary and community sector groups, services and organisations working with children and young people in the county of Somerset. CHYPPS has three main activities: to act as a forum for exchange of information; to support the development of effective practice and to represent, advocate, negotiate and influence for the benefit of the membership

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 February 2018

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,040

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 2009: Standard registration
  • 04 March 2019: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018
Total gross income £36.26k £72.23k £82.16k £6.31k £0
Total expenditure £47.13k £84.81k £96.11k £25.94k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A £56.29k £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A £15.94k £63.97k N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2018 22 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 22 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2016 21 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 21 July 2016 On Time