THE LORD SHUTTLEWORTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 500555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

relief of poverty, advancement of education and such other charitable causes as the trustees see fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,640
Total expenditure: £55,372

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lord Charles Shuttleworth Chair 16 November 1970
ROBERT HENRY WELCH
Received: On time
THE RACHEL KAY-SHUTTLEWORTH TEXTILE COLLECTIONS
Received: On time
LECK AND IREBY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Clare Kay-Shuttleworth Trustee 26 December 2019
None on record
David Charles Kay-Shuttleworth Trustee
None on record
THE LADY SHUTTLEWORTH Trustee
None on record
Thomas Edward Kay-Shuttleworth Trustee
LECK AND IREBY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ROBERT HENRY WELCH
Received: On time
THE HON WILLIAM JAMES KAY-SHUTTLEWORTH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.75k £8.20k £9.54k £14.06k £16.64k
Total expenditure £24.32k £30.84k £41.38k £50.20k £55.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ESTATE OFFICE
COWAN BRIDGE
CARNFORTH
LANCASHIRE
LA6 2HS
Phone:
01524271445
Website:

No information available