THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY INNOCENTS AND ST JOHN

Charity number: 1132166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £253,180
Total expenditure: £195,933

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hammersmith And Fulham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY INNOCENTS PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND David William Grover MATTHEWS Chair
ST JOHN'S HAMMERSMITH SUNDAY SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Ria Harrison Trustee 02 July 2023
None on record
Charles Harry Trustee 02 July 2023
None on record
Claudette Gray Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Anthony Michael Lowther Biggs Trustee 21 March 2021
JULIA CHRISTINA CLARKE'S HOME FUND
Received: On time
JULIA CHRISTINA CLARKE'S ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HAMMERSMITH SUNDAY SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Ms Janice Camell OBE Trustee 18 March 2018
None on record
Oliver Pearcey Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Jane Jales Trustee 26 April 2011
None on record
Caroline Gordon Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £211.01k £183.79k £176.17k £180.72k £253.18k
Total expenditure £188.01k £123.88k £134.64k £180.16k £195.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £476

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PADDENSWICK ROAD
LONDON
W6 0UB
Phone:
02087482286