Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY INNOCENTS AND ST JOHN
Charity number: 1132166
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND David William Grover MATTHEWS | Chair |
|
||||||||
Charles Harry | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ria Harrison | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Garrett William Chin | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Claudette Gray | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Michael Lowther Biggs | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ms Janice Camell OBE | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Robyn Gray | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Oliver Pearcey | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Jales | Trustee | 26 April 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Gordon | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.