MARKET HARBOROUGH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1132945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian faith according to the principle of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and other parts of the World.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £115,696
Total expenditure: £125,432

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity and another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • NEW HORIZONS COFFEE SHOP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev CHRISTOPHER SHENTON BROWN Chair 01 September 2016
None on record
Simon James Chew Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Lorna Margaret Murphy Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
John Albert Guilford Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Clifford Rex Gathercole Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Gathercole Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Mark Edmund Jones Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Dilys Rachel Emily Few Trustee 26 May 2022
LEICESTERSHIRE FOOTPATH ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £200.70k £87.09k £79.34k £154.19k £115.70k
Total expenditure £240.37k £74.40k £92.64k £102.43k £125.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
25 Coventry Road
MARKET HARBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE16 9BX
Phone:
01858414948