THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WILTON WITH NETHERHAMPTON AND FUGGLESTONE

Charity number: 1133776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of Christian Worship across the Parish

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £135,812
Total expenditure: £126,009

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • WILTON PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND MARK WOOD Chair
WILTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
WILLIAM GRAILYS' BEQUEST
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
GROVE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WILTON EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
WILTON MIDDLE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
THE MAJOR CHURCHES' NETWORK
Recently registered
Lyndsey Ann Nelms Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
PHILIP MATTHEWS Trustee 05 November 2020
THE MICHAEL HERBERT MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
RICHARD NORRIS Trustee 05 November 2020
WILTON EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST NICHOLAS PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Colonel Julian Lyne-Pirkis Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Gabrielle Ann Lynam Edwards MBE Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Roger David Best Trustee 01 November 2019
ST MARY AND ST NICHOLAS PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW TYRER Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
COLONEL NICHOLAS IAN BARSBY Trustee 09 May 2013
BEMERTON COMMUNITY
Received: On time
ANN MARGARET HINDLEY Trustee 25 October 2010
WILTON MIDDLE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
BRIGADIER NEILL PATRICK SCOTT O'CONNOR Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE MIRIAM LAWSON Trustee
None on record
MISS KATIE RAY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £141.75k £78.17k £84.55k £96.26k £135.81k
Total expenditure £136.65k £82.18k £79.09k £107.17k £126.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PARISH OFFICE
27 WEST STREET
WILTON
SALISBURY
SP2 0DL
Phone:
0172274393