THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, GILLINGHAM, ROCHESTER DIOCESE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable ordinary people to live out their faith as part of our parish community through: - Provision of regular and varied services - Provision of opportunities for spiritual growth and discussion - Reaching out into the wider community - Ensuring St Mary Magdalene Church is financial viable - Maintaining and building ecumenical partnerships - Complying with Health and Safety Standards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Medway
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY MAGDALENE PCC, GILLINGHAM, KENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Anne Cox | Chair | 08 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
Geraldine Parsons | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mavis Docker | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Hanning | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Ferrigan | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Brenda Bomers | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nichola Rawlins | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Sheward | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Neal Martin Clifton | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Bailey | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PATRICIA MAY PEARL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MO HOLLIDAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THOMAS STEPHEN MICHAEL BOMERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALEX PLUMB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.60k | £35.37k | £33.22k | £33.22k | £22.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.54k | £42.93k | £42.61k | £42.61k | £55.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Gillingham Green
GILLINGHAM
Kent
ME7 1SS
- Phone:
- 01634 321546
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window