THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN'S, PRENTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council (PCC) has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the Church; pastoral, ecclesiastic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for St. Stephen's church, St. Stephen's church hall and the curate's house, which it owns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
103 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 06 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST STEPHEN'S PCC, PRENTON (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter George Horton | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Cottier | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joel Giblett | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Graham Wiltshire | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Robert Bennett | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick John Giblett | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Webb | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Burton Fearnley | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Dunning | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Sandra Macdonald | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Phillips | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew John Graham | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH EARP | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Davies | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joan Potts | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN WARREN EARP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.76k | £127.90k | £155.04k | £222.56k | £190.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.17k | £131.72k | £120.43k | £172.61k | £191.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Stephens Church Hall
11 Prenton Lane
BIRKENHEAD
CH42 8LA
- Phone:
- 01516083638
- Email:
- office@ssp.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window