THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHURCH HULME

Charity Number: 1132587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian worship open to all providing opportunity for personal prayer and teaching. Pastoral work includes visiting the sick and bereaved. Promoting the mission of whole church through sermons, study groups, meetings etc. Activities are all-inclusive and embrace young people as well as senior church members . Supporting other charities in the diocese and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £157,002
Total expenditure: £147,922

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST LUKE'S PCC, HOLMES CHAPEL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Revd Canon Robert Ian McLaren Chair 22 November 2019
CRANAGE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Recently registered
Katharine Joanne Pilcher Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Simon James Kirkham Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Gillian Brickwood Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Dr Charlotte Louise Webb Trustee 11 July 2022
None on record
Janet Mary Chettle Trustee 09 May 2021
CRANAGE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Recently registered
CONGLETON STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Yvonne Janvier Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Rachel Elizabeth Grace Copley BA Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
COLIN STEPHEN HAIGH BA, ARCM Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
TREVOR JENKINS Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
WENDY MACDONALD Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
JAYNE MARIE WEAVER Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
Peter Stuart Cotton Trustee 07 August 2013
HOLMES CHAPEL AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
ALAN CHARLES RICKARDS Trustee 30 October 2011
None on record
TIMOTHY JOHN FRYER Trustee 30 October 2011
None on record
WILLIAM MATTHEW HALL ACIB Trustee
None on record
BARBARA JOAN SMITH Trustee
CHRISTIAN ENDEAVOUR HOLIDAY CENTRES LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr STEPHEN COLLYER SMITH D PHIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £139.75k £166.14k £193.92k £174.29k £157.00k
Total expenditure £143.23k £123.43k £178.39k £221.63k £147.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Luke's Church Hall
Parkway
Holmes Chapel
CREWE
CW4 7BA
Phone:
01477777123