THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, CROWBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican church located in Crowborough, East Sussex. Our primary objective is the promotion of the gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ according to the teaching of God's Word, The Bible, and enabling as many people as possible to find a living faith in Jesus Christ, and to become part of the Church Family, through worship and prayer, pastoral care and evangelistic and missionary work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£741,194
Donations and legacies | £637.79k | |
Charitable activities | £78.23k | |
Other trading activities | £1.01k | |
Investments | £24.16k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£748,106
Raising funds | £221 | |
Charitable activities | £747.89k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £221 | |
Charitable expenditure | £747.89k |
People

12 Employee(s)
22 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS PCC, CROWBOROUGH (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN PHILIP REES | Chair | 26 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Anthony Youlton | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Emily Jane Armitstead | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas E Herbert | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Avis Bishop | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas McDowell | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Zoe Allen | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Thrift | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Owen Winstone | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Graham Ashton | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alistair James Rapley | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Brackpool | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Smith | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Summers | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Freelove | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Macdowell | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven BURNS | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katharine FAIRBAIRN | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET GALT | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN DENNISON | Trustee | 06 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
IRENA VALENTINA MORRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £595.61k | £539.46k | £618.53k | £677.03k | £741.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £626.42k | £528.01k | £524.86k | £713.65k | £748.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £484.87k | £493.06k | £564.00k | £572.90k | £637.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.87k | £3.26k | £1.58k | £3.84k | £1.01k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £97.23k | £39.22k | £43.25k | £79.03k | £78.23k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.64k | £3.92k | £9.70k | £21.26k | £24.16k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £46.62k | £1.40k | £69.94k | £0 | £36.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £599.68k | £517.21k | £516.63k | £695.18k | £747.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.26k | £7.17k | £5.37k | £12.07k | £221 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £4.20k | £6.26k | £0 | £4.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £51.73k | £40.49k | £0 | £53.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £221 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £10.48k | £3.63k | £2.86k | £6.40k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £144.41k | £142.06k | £139.88k | £138.53k | £137.18k | |
|
Long-term investments | £31.89k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £366.22k | £415.38k | £513.86k | £477.69k | £469.61k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £37.52k | £40.06k | £42.69k | £41.80k | £39.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS CHURCH
CHURCH ROAD
CROWBOROUGH
TN6 1ED
- Phone:
- 01892652081
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window