THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KIRKBY STEPHEN WITH MALLERSTANG, CROSBY GARRETT AND SOULBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 07 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 22 June 2016: Funds received from 526932 THE SUNDAY SCHOOL CHARITY
- KIRKBY STEPHEN PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brendan Anthony Giblin | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Greenough | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|||||
William Richardson | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Anthony Cowling Reverend | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Jorysz | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan King MA | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Heath | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Paisley | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GORDON WHITE HUTTON MA | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Scott Coates | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JANE COWLING | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Edith Elizabeth Polkinhorn | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev CAROLE MARSDEN | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY HAUGHEY | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY EVELYN TURNER | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS CATHY PRIME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN DOROTHY ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR IAN ALLONBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev JEAN WRIGHT BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR MARTIN WYATT HOLDGATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENYS MARGARET LUMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.72k | £86.47k | £83.41k | £85.55k | £158.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.19k | £66.26k | £77.41k | £67.60k | £100.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARTINDALE FARM
CROSBY GARRETT
KIRKBY STEPHEN
CA17 4PW
- Phone:
- 01768371449
- Email:
- MARTINDALERS@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window