THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF RICHMOND WITH HUDSWELL

Charity Number: 1132585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC is the governing body of Richmond with Hudswell parish - St Mary's, Richmond (N Yorkshire) and St Michael and all Angels, Hudswell village. With the clergy, we are responsible for church work in the parish: providing regular public worship, evangelism, pastoral, educational, cultural and social work and maintaining church buildings, and collaboration with other Christians in Richmond.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £154,416
Total expenditure: £138,423

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • RICHMOND WITH HUDSWELL PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Martin Fletcher Rev Chair 26 April 2018
HUDSWELL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
REVEREND MATTHEW HUTCHINSON'S RICHMOND CHARITY
Received: On time
REVEREND MATTHEW HUTCHINSON'S GILLING CHARITY
Received: On time
REVEREND JOHN JACKSON'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
HUDSWELL COMMUNITY CHARITY
Received: On time
Pamela Betty Holland Trustee 20 May 2023
RICHMOND AND DALES TALKING NEWSPAPER
Received: On time
Stephanie Jane Williamson Trustee 07 May 2023
KIPLIN HALL CIO
Received: On time
Susan Wendy Pritchard Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
John Frederick MCormack MA Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Anna Charles Warren Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Annette Richardson Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Stuart Rowan Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Colin Erwin Hicks Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
David Ian Short Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
John William Challis Trustee 09 May 2021
PAUL CURRAN CELEBRATION TRUST
Received: On time
Susan Scrafton Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
Rev Paul Jaime Sunderland Trustee 04 July 2020
None on record
Sharon Rebecca McCormack BA Trustee 15 May 2017
None on record
Dr Peter Trewby Trustee 26 March 2017
THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, RICHMOND, NORTH YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
REVEREND MATTHEW HUTCHINSON'S RICHMOND CHARITY
Received: On time
SUSAN ELIZABETH WELCH Trustee 30 October 2012
None on record
JONATHAN WINSTANLEY ROBERTS Trustee 22 September 2011
TEESSIDE ASTRONOMICAL SCIENCE CENTRE
Received: On time
DAVID NICHOLAS FRANKTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £155.83k £134.69k £152.20k £131.39k £154.42k
Total expenditure £151.07k £149.60k £148.57k £128.24k £138.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 November 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 November 2023 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Rectory
Church Wynd
RICHMOND
North Yorkshire
DL10 7AQ
Phone:
01748 821241
Email:
No information available