THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE'S CULLERCOATS

Charity Number: 1134800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St George's Church provides a focal point for the people of Cullercoats.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £88,877
Total expenditure: £97,763

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Tyneside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST GEORGE'S PCC, CULLERCOATS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pauline Murray Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Jonathan Ryland Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Nathan Batten Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Gordon Wightman Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Ann Elizabeth Lilley Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Rosemary Kinghorn Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Paul Peter Corrigan Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Sean Dowinton Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Vivienne Barke Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Aubrey James Bowles Trustee 19 March 2017
None on record
Andrew Pinkett Trustee 27 April 2015
None on record
BRIAN MCNALLY Trustee 09 June 2011
THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINT GEORGE, CULLERCOATS
Received: On time
MICHAEL ALFRED NICHOLSON Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
REVEREND ADRIAN HUGHES Trustee
MARDEN HIGH SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
5TH WHITLEY BAY (ST GEORGE'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
DOROTHY MARGARET PATTERSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £88.83k £108.71k £86.79k £114.14k £88.88k
Total expenditure £90.67k £96.20k £86.41k £111.37k £97.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £600 £600 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE VICARAGE
1 BEVERLEY GARDENS
NORTH SHIELDS
NE30 4NS
Phone:
01912521817
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available