THE MAASAI RAFIKI PROJECT

Charity Number: 1132170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Maasai Rafiki Project supports grassroots development in Maasai communities in Tanzania. Current work is focusing on providing clean water and sanitation. Our projects are designed in partnership with the local community to be self-sustainable.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 10 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Tanzania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 March 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 19 March 2018: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR JENNY BArber Chair
None on record
EMMA JOHNSTON SMITH Trustee 29 October 2011
None on record
CLAIRE FRASER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/09/2019 10/09/2020 10/09/2021 10/09/2022 10/09/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 September 2023 17 September 2024 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 10 September 2022 05 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 10 September 2021 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 September 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 September 2019 29 March 2021 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 MOORFIELD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M20 2UY
Phone:
07738470683
Email:
No information available