Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.ANDREW'S,PRESTON WITH SUTTON POYNTZ
Charity number: 1131901

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Kingsley Menzies | Chair | 20 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Jefferis | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Kepple | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Slee | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Charles Rodemark | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Heaton Grainger | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Raymond Garrett | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY ROY LIGHT | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wood | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Alison Burton Mrs | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Crisp | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEARY | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|||||
THERESA MARIE CLAYTON | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS SHIRLEY JUNE DAVIES | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.