FRIENDS OF FIVE WAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Five Ways seeks to develop relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school via quiz nights, plant sale and other activities. The funds raised through these activites allow the Friends of Five Ways to provide facilities and equipment which support the school and neighbourhood as well as advancing the education and welfare of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 04 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Louisa Collins | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lewis | Trustee | 03 May 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £6.55k | £6.96k | £3.33k | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.62k | £6.92k | £5.67k | £6.58k | £864 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1412 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1412 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1777 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1777 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KING EDWARD VI FIVE WAYS SCHOOL
SCOTLAND LANE
BIRMINGHAM
B32 4BT
- Phone:
- 01214753535
- Email:
- office@kefw.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window