HELPING HANDS DOG RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
rescuing death row dogs to be rehomed once they have been both medically & behavioural assesment have been carried out
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 June 2010: Standard registration
- 28 October 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2011 | 01/01/2012 | 01/01/2013 | 01/01/2014 | 01/01/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.46k | £16.43k | £20.59k | £22.78k | £21.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.88k | £17.00k | £23.42k | £23.67k | £18.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2015 | 12 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2014 | 22 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2013 | 03 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2012 | 31 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window