PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCILOF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR WITH ST MARY COTHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish Church (Anglican)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 23 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- COTHAM PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John Stephenson | Chair | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maria Josephine Fenner | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lee Jacoby | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Heath | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Adrian Howkins | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mayo | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan John Schaefer | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Carr | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Leggat-Green | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Robinson | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE HAWKINS | Trustee | 07 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SALLY SEAMAN | Trustee | 07 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.37k | £110.16k | £148.66k | £181.81k | £354.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.82k | £150.37k | £256.82k | £189.40k | £681.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
COTHAM PARISH CHURCH
COTHAM ROAD
BRISTOL
BS6 6DR
- Phone:
- 01179733395
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window