GIVEALL2CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The commission-free fundraising platform provides all charities, and donors with An online fundraising platform Payroll Giving at zero cost; providing the most tax-effective way to support charity A proprietary banking platform & cash management solution Wealth Management Services where 100% of all commission is returned to charity Other essential services & software solutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Standard registration
- GIVEALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerhardus Petrus Visagie | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY FRANCIS PHILLIPS | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL MONEO GRIER | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
SHANE CLAIRE KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.83k | £69.83k | £52.29k | £5.09k | £5.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £474.06k | £474.06k | £0 | £53.00k | £12.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 09 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME 13 NOVEMBER 2009 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
1 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SUBJECTS OF MATHEMATICS, SCIENCE AND ENGLISH, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2 PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES BY ADVANCING THE TRAINING OF CHARITY TRUSTEES AND STAFF IN GOOD CORPORATE GOVERNANCE AND EFFICIENT FUNDRAISING OR BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANK HOUSE
81 ST. JUDES ROAD
ENGLEFIELD GREEN
EGHAM
TW20 0DF
- Phone:
- 01784439958
- Email:
- info@giveall.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window