THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, HAUGHTON LE SKERNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANDREW'S PCC, HAUGHTON LE SKERNE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS P.N.YOUNG | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amy Farquhar Gooding | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Angela Day | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Katharine Teague | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Denise Williams | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MERVYN GORMLEY | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane McTimoney | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
TERESA CHRISTINE KENNEDY | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Teague | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Karen Padurariu | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK EAST | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MIKE BIRD | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS G.JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS E.C.KAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev SUSAN CHEW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.44k | £137.43k | £142.43k | £138.23k | £175.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.47k | £120.31k | £138.15k | £122.43k | £148.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Andrews Church Office
Haughton Green
DARLINGTON
DL1 2DD
- Phone:
- 01325468142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window