East Staffordshire and South Derbyshire Methodist Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Methodist Church are the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

45 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- BURTON ON TRENT METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- TRENT AND DOVE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
45 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa TILLEY | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
TERESA ANNE HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David G Palmer | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Joy Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Hackett | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HANCOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES ELIZABETH NAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DILYS HARPER | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Janet Palmer | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Barnett | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Bird | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER HEATHER ILLSLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Kesterton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RITA MARY WALTON | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Rowland Ball | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stuart Gilbey | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Evans | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Harrell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victor Appleby | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hawkins | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Hancock | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE GREEN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET DUNSBY | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNN WRAGG | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev STELLA FREDA MILLS | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HILL | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV MIKE REDSHAW | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
ROGER ROOKE | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CELIA HELEN RYAN | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Panter | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN RYAN | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JONES | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Knight | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE MCLOUGHLIN B SC | Trustee | 02 April 2012 |
|
|||||
JEAN GLORIA HOLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY JUNE TOON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RITA MAY STREET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSANNA RUTH NICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HERMAN JOHANNES BONARDT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW WOODING B.A. MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CHARLES JAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.65k | £323.24k | £1.09m | £530.36k | £486.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £271.15k | £476.06k | £505.27k | £535.14k | £602.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £22.54k | £20.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £219.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £3.58k | £33.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £800.53k | £256.73k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £505.27k | £535.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £11.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 03 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 The Delph Centre
Swadlincote
Derbyshire
DE11 9DA
- Phone:
- 01283217168
- Email:
- rachel.wood@methodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window