THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEW BRIGHTON ST. JAMES WITH EMMANUEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In line with the general activities as specified by the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev HEATHER ATKINSON | Chair | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Fryer | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Cooper-Clark | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Cliff-Wilcock | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ron Jones | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Merrill | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Brown | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Lloyd | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Barlow | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vanessa Martlew | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jones | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Adams | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JONES | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Collins | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|||||
SALLY GILES | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN ANN CHADWICK | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|||||
MR RICHARD WILBERFORCE | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR JOHN TIMMS B.SC (HONS), C.ENG, MRINA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH LOUISE MERRILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.23k | £77.75k | £144.54k | £118.11k | £125.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.23k | £82.63k | £137.83k | £116.84k | £132.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Sunningdale Road
WALLASEY
Merseyside
CH45 0LU
- Phone:
- 01516395468
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window