THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALFEGE, GREENWICH

Charity number: 1133046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC of St. Alfege, Greenwich is responsible for promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church of England, pastoral, social, ecumenical and evangelical. It has maintenance responsibilities for St. Alfege Church, a Grade 1 listed building, and for the church hall and other properties, and decides how PCC funds should be spent.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £430,671
Total expenditure: £438,406

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. ALFEGE, GREENWICH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Simon Reynolds Winn Chair 23 March 2021
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
Helen Phoebe Springbett Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Karen Frances Hansen Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Graham Ross Voke Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Amanda Jenkins Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Christopher James Atkinson Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Joyce Skeete Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Neil Antony Jenkins Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Grahame Elliott Woods Trustee 29 April 2023
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Peter Sean Vernon Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Moses Ekole Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Richard Alan Hinton Mash Trustee 09 October 2022
None on record
Rev Dr Robert Tobin Trustee 11 September 2022
None on record
Rev Tatiana Gutteridge Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Victoria Ajoku Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Andrew Murray Lewis Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Aaron Nissan Levin Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Alison Claire Wood Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Benjamin Alexander Crompton Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Daisy Smith Trustee 24 March 2019
None on record
David McEvoy Trustee 24 March 2019
None on record
Dr Irene Bishop CBE Trustee 06 May 2018
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
CHRIST'S CHAPEL OF GOD'S GIFT AT DULWICH
Received: On time
Simon Douglas Ian Gallie Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
PETER STEWART KINNISON Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
CAROLE MOSES Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
WENDY VALERIE FOREMAN Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £523.04k £382.96k £495.89k £370.04k £430.67k
Total expenditure £1.85m £949.33k £503.14k £464.28k £438.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £180.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £40 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £204.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £137.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £7.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.80m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.69k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £9.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £9.03k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 1 NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALFEGE WITH ST. PETER, GREENWICH AND SUBJECT THERETO TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES IN THE SAID PARISH CHURCH AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FURNITURE THEREIN.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST ALFEGE WITH ST PETER, GREENWICH
Registration history
  • 20 June 1980 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St. Alfege Church
Greenwich Church Street
LONDON
SE10 9BJ
Phone:
02088530687