DATE VALLEY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational provision for Early Years and Primary, promoting the Islamic Ethos. The child is taught about the importance of caring and respecting friends, teachers and parents. The children maintain a high level of education, due to small class sizes. Most importantly we aim to create a conducive Islamic environment, by making Islam an integral part of the child's life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income:
£747,172
Donations and legacies | £28.94k | |
Charitable activities | £663.59k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £54.64k |
Total expenditure:
£789,602
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £789.60k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £789.60k |
People

22 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Merton
Governance
- 10 June 2010: Standard registration
- DATE VALLEY SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rashma Begum | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiza Rahman Sara | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rena Begum | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £749.18k | £748.46k | £771.87k | £729.44k | £747.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £717.62k | £742.63k | £715.39k | £676.11k | £789.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £108.61k | £123.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.40k | £2.17k | £1.46k | £0 | £28.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £685.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £745.78k | £612.52k | £85.30k | £729.44k | £663.59k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £133.78k | £0 | £0 | £54.64k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £709.99k | £714.28k | £0 | £676.11k | £789.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.63k | £28.36k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.45k | £8.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £715.39k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.76k | £5.07k | £3.80k | £12.68k | £16.72k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £242.93k | £260.12k | £316.01k | £373.02k | £328.73k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £166.68k | £176.35k | £176.02k | £188.58k | £190.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE OPERATION OF ONE OR MORE SCHOOLS FOR BOYS AND GIRLS WHICH MAY EMPHASISE THE ISLAMIC FAITH WHILE NOT EXCLUDING STUDENTS OF OTHER FAITHS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mitcham Court
Cricket Green
Mitcham
CR4 4LB
- Phone:
- 02086484647
- Email:
- managingdirector@dvst.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window