THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, HESWALL

Charity number: 1135105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity exists to provide public worship according to the rites and ceremonies of the Church of England as well as pastoral care and social and religious activities for residents of the ecclesiastical Parish of Heswall. It also seeks to promote the aims of the Church of England (spiritual, social, pastoral and evangelistic) in the community of Heswall and in the wider world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HESWALL PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV MARTIN STAFFORD JOHN CANNAM Chair 13 September 2015
None on record
Roy Edward Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Jonathan Mark Francis Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
James NORMAN Waddell Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Janice Patricia Bell Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Margaret Eleanor Archer Trustee 17 May 2023
THE WIRRAL SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Samuel John Leinster Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
DAVID OST Trustee 04 May 2022
OPERATION MOBILISATION
Received: On time
Geraldine Elizabeth Pleasance Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Stephen David Blair Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Helen Mooney Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Helen Claire Abbott Page Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Michael Donnan Trustee 16 January 2019
MRS AGNES PARKER HOUGHTON
Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
THE ZOOM ZOOM TRUST
Received: On time
WIRRAL FOODBANK
Received: On time
WIRRAL FOODBANK
Received: On time
DR PENNY'S FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Rev Joshua Alan Carlson Trustee 22 July 2018
None on record
David Robert Wetherell Trustee 25 April 2014
BESOM IN WIRRAL
Received: On time
DAVID RUSHWORTH Trustee 08 June 2011
THE RUSHWORTH TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Christine Elizabeth Wetherell Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £960.05k £610.70k £719.92k £711.99k £559.58k
Total expenditure £447.86k £291.09k £411.34k £410.42k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £898.26k £550.23k £647.49k £618.02k £472.04k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £52.65k £36.71k £50.67k £66.09k £57.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.13k £23.76k £21.76k £27.88k £30.47k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £48.88k £70.00k £27.69k £97.53k £1.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £432.42k £281.21k £401.50k £394.04k £466.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.51k £5.93k £6.17k £6.54k £6.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £14.29k £8.97k £22.77k £19.79k £25.47k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £15.44k £9.88k £9.84k £16.38k £657.66k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £267.64k £1.03m £1.18m £2.29m £2.54m
Long-term investments £951.60k £347.52k £450.17k £398.62k £130.10k
Other assets £1.25m £1.34m £1.46m £822.86k £387.75k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £83.11k £7.99k £46.88k £182.37k £332.48k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Parish Office
Village Road
Heswall
Wirral
CH60 0DZ
Phone:
01513423471