THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S, HURST GREEN, SURREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Normal activities involved in the day to day running of a Church including pastoral activities and religious services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
89 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC, HURST GREEN, SURREY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan Bosley | Chair | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Long | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BARBARA BATLEY | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Parker | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Strolz | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ainsworth | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Hilary Dilnot | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Nicholls | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Richards | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julian Taylor | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Henk Van Den Berg | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Johns | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
THE REVD PROFESSOR MARY JOAN SELLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET MARGARET HARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.49k | £135.58k | £140.85k | £154.76k | £178.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.84k | £140.60k | £131.50k | £149.03k | £190.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.79k | £12.13k | £5.38k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John the Evangelist
Church Way
Hurst Green
Oxted
Surrey
RH8 9EA
- Phone:
- 01883715301
- Email:
- office@stjhurstgreen.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window