THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, FELPHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church providing religious services and social activities to the people of the parish of Felpham, Bognor Regis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
240 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, FELPHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John William Challis | Chair | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Glenn Potter | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Copeland | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Walker | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Holmes | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne French | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter French | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Lowen | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Wand | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Treacy | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wand | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Williams | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Fido | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joan Margaret Bull | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE ELIZABETH HAMMILL | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE CHRISTIE | Trustee | 14 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MARGARET BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.54k | £133.86k | £147.25k | £120.07k | £122.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.03k | £112.93k | £162.69k | £168.34k | £181.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | £4.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary's Centre
Grassmere Close
Felpham
West Sussex
PO22 7NU
- Phone:
- 01243 826886
- Email:
- stmaryscentre@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window