LINCOLN & LINDSEY BLIND SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society works to improve the overall quality of life for people with a visual impairment in North Lincolnshire, North East Lincolnshire, East and West Lindsey and Lincoln City. We achieve this by enabling and encouraging independent living through home visiting, the provision of and access to information, equipment and services and the development of community based activities and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 October 2009: Standard registration
- 02 July 2019: Funds received from 702610 THE LINCOLN SPIRITUAL ASSOCIATION
- 14 September 2019: Funds received from 217323 LINCOLN AND LINDSEY BLIND SOCIETY
- 22 October 2021: Funds received from 512843 LINCOLN TALKING NEWSPAPER
- 29 November 2023: Funds received from 513532 SOUNDSCENE TALKING MAGAZINE FOR THE BLIND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy James Dixon | Chair | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Jo Challis | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Peacock | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Edward Kelsey | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Stewart Edmonds | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Selfe | Trustee | 22 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Durham | Trustee | 17 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Audrey Moore | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD GENN | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £543.07k | £181.40k | £220.76k | £364.75k | £317.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345.12k | £314.85k | £329.57k | £362.83k | £409.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £461.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £48.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £28.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £414.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £324.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £6.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF AND EDUCATION IN INDEPENDENT LIVING SKILLS OF BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE IN THE CITY OF LINCOLN, EAST AND WEST LINDSEY, NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CENTRES ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LINCOLN, EAST AND WEST LINDSEY, NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRADBURY HOUSE
RAMSGATE
LOUTH
LINCOLNSHIRE
LN11 0NB
- Phone:
- 01507605604
- Email:
- info@llbs.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window