THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JUDES, WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, open to all. The provision for sacred space for prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching Christianity through sermon, courses and small groups. Provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JUDES PCC, WOLVERHAMPTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Fenner | Chair | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kweku Oman-Tetteh | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Griffith Wallbridge | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Rosemary Peach | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
AMITA SUDRA | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Chipo Cynthia Utete | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Pradip Sudra | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Reynolds | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Harrington | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Simon Hewitt | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.24k | £110.30k | £101.75k | £88.92k | £103.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.69k | £111.80k | £214.48k | £99.74k | £98.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.25k | £7.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21A ST. JUDES ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 0EB
- Phone:
- 01902 753360
- Email:
- sjudeschurch@virginmedia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window