THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, NOTTING HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church exists to witness the good news of the God made known in Jesus Christ. St Peter's seeks to be open to God and relevant to the needs of the neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,960 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S PCC, NOTTING HILL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reverend Pat Allerton | Chair | 12 September 2017 |
|
|||||
William Jeffreys Hortman | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fransien Mensen | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William David Clarke | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Gillum | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lianne Michelle Turner | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Betty Agnes Rebecca Campbell | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Maurice Edwards | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Terrence Ashton O'Regan | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernhard Peter Ramseyer | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra DeVere Rogers | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Eric Simmons | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £599.10k | £462.24k | £459.76k | £429.29k | £343.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £641.08k | £603.14k | £429.05k | £288.11k | £355.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £91.91k | £123.35k | £74.35k | £17.95k | £1.96k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £305.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £293.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £42 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £641.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Peter's Organisation
59A Portobello Road
LONDON
W11 3DB
- Phone:
- 02077928227
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window