Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HUCKNALL TORKARD
Charity number: 1132272

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Sissons | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Towers | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Johnson | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Campbell | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachael Burns | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Aldred | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Chantry | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eric Ridley | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Haywood | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Turner | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Barron | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Kowalski | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HANDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA MONK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.